H.R. No. 788 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, The tragic loss of Terry Glenn Bailey, 54, and his wife, Pamela Hitt Bailey, 57, of Center on February 15, 2017, has deeply saddened their family and friends and the many people in their community whose lives they touched; and WHEREAS, Born in Center on March 13, 1962, Terry Bailey was the son of Millard and Charlotte Bailey; a self-made businessman, he found success in the logging and oil industries and went on to establish and own a multitude of different companies over the course of his lifetime; and WHEREAS, The former Pamela Hitt was born on August 26, 1959, to Charles and Ann Hitt, and she graduated from Stephen F. Austin State University with a degree in business; after marrying Terry Bailey on September 27, 1980, she became the anchor of their treasured family, which grew to include two children, Carmen and Dustin, and four grandchildren, Falon, Ivy, Trevor, and Taygan; and WHEREAS, This devoted husband and wife were ideal partners, and together, they invested in their community by turning over start-up businesses to budding entrepreneurs and purchasing land to build schools and churches; they were also the owners of a deer breeding facility in Center, and as lifetime members of the Texas Deer Association, they forged numerous friendships and made vital contributions to the deer industry across the country; with Mr. Bailey's larger-than-life personality and Mrs. Bailey's innate kindness, they shared a natural ability to uplift and inspire others, and they thrived on the joy of having a close-knit family and a wealth of cherished friends and colleagues; and WHEREAS, Although tragedy has brought an untimely end to the lives of these two beloved Texans, Terry and Pam Bailey leave behind a legacy of dedication to their family and their community that will be remembered and admired for many years to come; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Terry and Pamela Bailey and extend heartfelt sympathy to their relatives and many friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Terry and Pamela Bailey. Paddie Straus Goldman Oliverson Straus Goldman Oliverson Straus Goldman Oliverson Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie Alvarado Gooden Parker Alvarado Gooden Parker Alvarado Gooden Parker Anchia Guerra Paul Anchia Guerra Paul Anchia Guerra Paul Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan Arévalo Hefner Phillips Arévalo Hefner Phillips Arévalo Hefner Phillips Ashby Hernandez Pickett Ashby Hernandez Pickett Ashby Hernandez Pickett Bailes Herrero Price Bailes Herrero Price Bailes Herrero Price Bell Hinojosa Raney Bell Hinojosa Raney Bell Hinojosa Raney Bernal Holland Raymond Bernal Holland Raymond Bernal Holland Raymond Biedermann Howard Reynolds Biedermann Howard Reynolds Biedermann Howard Reynolds Blanco Huberty Rinaldi Blanco Huberty Rinaldi Blanco Huberty Rinaldi Bohac Hunter Roberts Bohac Hunter Roberts Bohac Hunter Roberts Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burns Johnson of Harris Rose Burns Johnson of Harris Rose Burns Johnson of Harris Rose Burrows Kacal Sanford Burrows Kacal Sanford Burrows Kacal Sanford Button Keough Schaefer Button Keough Schaefer Button Keough Schaefer Cain King of Hemphill Schofield Cain King of Hemphill Schofield Cain King of Hemphill Schofield Canales King of Parker Schubert Canales King of Parker Schubert Canales King of Parker Schubert Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen Clardy Klick Sheffield Clardy Klick Sheffield Clardy Klick Sheffield Coleman Koop Shine Coleman Koop Shine Coleman Koop Shine Collier Krause Simmons Collier Krause Simmons Collier Krause Simmons Cook Kuempel Smithee Cook Kuempel Smithee Cook Kuempel Smithee Cortez Lambert Springer Cortez Lambert Springer Cortez Lambert Springer Cosper Landgraf Stephenson Cosper Landgraf Stephenson Cosper Landgraf Stephenson Craddick Lang Stickland Craddick Lang Stickland Craddick Lang Stickland Cyrier Larson Stucky Cyrier Larson Stucky Cyrier Larson Stucky Dale Laubenberg Swanson Dale Laubenberg Swanson Dale Laubenberg Swanson Darby Leach Thierry Darby Leach Thierry Darby Leach Thierry Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris Dean Lucio III Tinderholt Dean Lucio III Tinderholt Dean Lucio III Tinderholt Deshotel Martinez Turner Deshotel Martinez Turner Deshotel Martinez Turner Dukes Metcalf Uresti Dukes Metcalf Uresti Dukes Metcalf Uresti Dutton Meyer VanDeaver Dutton Meyer VanDeaver Dutton Meyer VanDeaver Elkins Miller Villalba Elkins Miller Villalba Elkins Miller Villalba Faircloth Minjarez Vo Faircloth Minjarez Vo Faircloth Minjarez Vo Fallon Moody Walle Fallon Moody Walle Fallon Moody Walle Farrar Morrison White Farrar Morrison White Farrar Morrison White Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Frank Murphy Workman Frank Murphy Workman Frank Murphy Workman Frullo Murr Wray Frullo Murr Wray Frullo Murr Wray Geren Neave Wu Geren Neave Wu Geren Neave Wu Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler Giddings Oliveira Zerwas Giddings Oliveira Zerwas Giddings Oliveira Zerwas ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 788 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on March 14, 2017. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Straus Goldman Oliverson Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie Alvarado Gooden Parker Anchia Guerra Paul Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan Arévalo Hefner Phillips Ashby Hernandez Pickett Bailes Herrero Price Bell Hinojosa Raney Bernal Holland Raymond Biedermann Howard Reynolds Blanco Huberty Rinaldi Bohac Hunter Roberts Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burns Johnson of Harris Rose Burrows Kacal Sanford Button Keough Schaefer Cain King of Hemphill Schofield Canales King of Parker Schubert Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen Clardy Klick Sheffield Coleman Koop Shine Collier Krause Simmons Cook Kuempel Smithee Cortez Lambert Springer Cosper Landgraf Stephenson Craddick Lang Stickland Cyrier Larson Stucky Dale Laubenberg Swanson Darby Leach Thierry Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris Dean Lucio III Tinderholt Deshotel Martinez Turner Dukes Metcalf Uresti Dutton Meyer VanDeaver Elkins Miller Villalba Faircloth Minjarez Vo Fallon Moody Walle Farrar Morrison White Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Frank Murphy Workman Frullo Murr Wray Geren Neave Wu Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler Giddings Oliveira Zerwas