House | 03/28/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Filed |