House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3236 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1903 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 1793 |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1752 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1752 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1752 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |