House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1207 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1176 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |