Senate | 05/08/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 858 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |