Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1046 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Estes S.B. No. 1046
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; March 30, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 3; March 30, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to sources of funding for the Texas emissions reduction
 plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.0515(d), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  This section expires on the last day of the state fiscal
 biennium during which the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 publishes in the Texas Register certification that, with respect to
 each national ambient air quality standard for ozone under 40
 C.F.R. Section 81.344, the United States Environmental Protection
 Agency has, for each designated area under that section:
 (1)  designated the area as attainment or
 unclassifiable; or
 (2)  approved a redesignation substitute making a
 finding of attainment for the area [August 31, 2019].
 SECTION 2.  Section 152.0215(c), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  This section expires on the last day of the state fiscal
 biennium during which the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 publishes in the Texas Register certification that, with respect to
 each national ambient air quality standard for ozone under 40
 C.F.R. Section 81.344, the United States Environmental Protection
 Agency has, for each designated area under that section:
 (1)  designated the area as attainment or
 unclassifiable; or
 (2)  approved a redesignation substitute making a
 finding of attainment for the area [August 31, 2019].
 SECTION 3.  Section 501.138, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) and adding
 Subsection (b-4) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-4), fees [Fees]
 collected under Subsection (b) to be sent to the comptroller shall
 be deposited to the credit of the Texas [Mobility Fund, except that
 $5 of each fee imposed under Subsection (a)(1) and deposited on or
 after September 1, 2008, and before September 1, 2015, shall be
 deposited to the credit of the Texas] emissions reduction plan
 fund.
 (b-2)  The comptroller shall establish a record of the amount
 of the fees deposited to the credit of the Texas emissions reduction
 plan fund [Mobility Fund] under Subsection (b-1).  On or before the
 fifth workday of each month, the Texas Department of Transportation
 shall remit to the comptroller for deposit to the credit of the
 Texas Mobility Fund [emissions reduction plan fund] an amount of
 money equal to the amount of the fees deposited by the comptroller
 to the credit of the Texas emissions reduction plan fund [Mobility
 Fund] under Subsection (b-1) in the preceding month.  The Texas
 Department of Transportation shall use for remittance to the
 comptroller as required by this subsection money in the state
 highway fund that is not required to be used for a purpose specified
 by Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and may not use
 for that remittance money received by this state under the
 congestion mitigation and air quality improvement program
 established under 23 U.S.C. Section 149.
 (b-3)  This subsection and Subsections (b-1) and
 [Subsection] (b-2) expire on the last day of the state fiscal
 biennium during which the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 publishes in the Texas Register certification that, with respect to
 each national ambient air quality standard for ozone under 40
 C.F.R. Section 81.344, the United States Environmental Protection
 Agency has, for each designated area under that section:
 (1)  designated the area as attainment or
 unclassifiable; or
 (2)  approved a redesignation substitute making a
 finding of attainment for the area [August 31, 2019].
 (b-4)  Fees collected under Subsection (b) to be sent to the
 comptroller shall be deposited to the credit of the Texas Mobility
 Fund if the fees are collected on or after the last day of the state
 fiscal biennium during which the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality publishes in the Texas Register certification that, with
 respect to each national ambient air quality standard for ozone
 under 40 C.F.R. Section 81.344, the United States Environmental
 Protection Agency has, for each designated area under that section:
 (1)  designated the area as attainment or
 unclassifiable; or
 (2)  approved a redesignation substitute making a
 finding of attainment for the area.
 SECTION 4.  Section 502.358(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This section expires on the last day of the state fiscal
 biennium during which the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 publishes in the Texas Register certification that, with respect to
 each national ambient air quality standard for ozone under 40
 C.F.R. Section 81.344, the United States Environmental Protection
 Agency has, for each designated area under that section:
 (1)  designated the area as attainment or
 unclassifiable; or
 (2)  approved a redesignation substitute making a
 finding of attainment for the area [August 31, 2019].
 SECTION 5.  The heading to Section 548.5055, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 548.5055.  TEXAS EMISSIONS [EMISSION] REDUCTION PLAN
 FEE.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 548.5055(b) and (c), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department shall remit fees collected under this
 section to the comptroller at the time and in the manner prescribed
 by the comptroller for deposit in the Texas emissions [emission]
 reduction plan fund.
 (c)  This section expires on the last day of the state fiscal
 biennium during which the conservation commission publishes in the
 Texas Register certification that, with respect to each national
 ambient air quality standard for ozone under 40 C.F.R. Section
 81.344, the United States Environmental Protection Agency has, for
 each designated area under that section:
 (1)  designated the area as attainment or
 unclassifiable; or
 (2)  approved a redesignation substitute making a
 finding of attainment for the area [August 31, 2019].
 SECTION 7.  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 501.138, Transportation Code, apply only to a fee collected on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A fee collected before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
 fee was collected, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017, but only
 if S.B. 26, or similar legislation of the 85th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2017, that changes the expiration dates for the Texas
 emissions reduction plan and certain programs funded under that
 plan becomes law.  If such a bill does not become law, this Act has
 no effect.
 * * * * *