E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5568
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3550
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3550
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3550
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4407
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1631
|
Journal Page: 4407
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4407
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4407
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/22/17 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4230
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 715
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 575
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|