E | 05/18/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2113 | |
E | 05/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1732 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3022 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2530 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#743 | Journal Page: 2529 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2529 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2529 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1924 | Journal Page: 2375 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 2124 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2124 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1704 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |