House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1977 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |