Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1087 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1087
2- (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2017; March 7, 2017,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4- April 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
5- Nays 0; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
72
83
94 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
105 AN ACT
116 relating to the regulation of the hours of instruction for
127 cosmetology licensing.
138 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
149 SECTION 1. Section 1602.254(b), Occupations Code, is
1510 amended to read as follows:
1611 (b) To be eligible for an operator license, an applicant
1712 must meet the requirements of Subsection (c) or:
1813 (1) be at least 17 years of age;
1914 (2) have obtained a high school diploma or the
2015 equivalent of a high school diploma or have passed a valid
2116 examination administered by a certified testing agency that
2217 measures the person's ability to benefit from training; and
2318 (3) have completed:
2419 (A) 1,000 [1,500] hours of instruction in a
2520 licensed beauty culture school; or
2621 (B) 1,000 hours of instruction in beauty culture
2722 courses and 500 hours of related high school courses prescribed by
2823 the commission in a vocational cosmetology program in a public
2924 school.
3025 SECTION 2. Section 1602.451(a), Occupations Code, is
3126 amended to read as follows:
3227 (a) The holder of a private beauty culture school license
3328 shall:
3429 (1) maintain a sanitary establishment;
3530 (2) maintain on duty one licensed instructor for each
3631 25 students in attendance;
3732 (3) maintain a daily record of students' attendance;
3833 (4) establish regular class and instruction hours and
3934 grades;
4035 (5) require a school term of not less than six [nine]
4136 months and not less than 1,000 [1,500] hours instruction for a
4237 complete course in cosmetology;
4338 (6) require a school term of not less than 600 hours
4439 instruction for a complete course in manicuring;
4540 (7) hold examinations before issuing diplomas;
4641 (8) maintain a copy of the school's curriculum in a
4742 conspicuous place and verify that the curriculum is being followed;
4843 (9) publish in the school's catalogue and enrollment
4944 contract a description of the refund policy required under Section
5045 1602.458; and
5146 (10) provide the department with information on:
5247 (A) the current course completion rates of
5348 students who attend a course of instruction offered by the school;
5449 and
5550 (B) job placement rates and employment rates of
5651 students who complete the course of instruction.
5752 SECTION 3. Section 1603.255, Occupations Code, is amended
5853 to read as follows:
5954 Sec. 1603.255. EARLY EXAMINATION. The department may allow
6055 for the early written examination of a student who has completed the
6156 following number of hours of instruction in a department-approved
6257 training program:
6358 (1) 1,000 hours for a student seeking a Class A barber
6459 certificate [or operator license] in a private barber [or
6560 cosmetology] school; [or]
6661 (2) 900 hours for a student seeking an operator
6762 license in a private cosmetology school; or
6863 (3) 900 hours for a student seeking a Class A barber
6964 certificate or operator license in a publicly funded barber or
7065 cosmetology school.
7166 SECTION 4. As soon as practicable after the effective date
7267 of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
7368 adopt rules implementing Chapter 1602, Occupations Code, as amended
7469 by this Act.
7570 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act to Section
7671 1602.254(b), Occupations Code, applies only to an application for
7772 an operator license submitted on or after September 1, 2018. An
7873 application for an operator license submitted before that date is
7974 governed by the law in effect on the date the application was
8075 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
8176 purpose.
8277 SECTION 6. (a) The changes in law made by this Act do not
8378 affect the validity of a proceeding pending before the court or
8479 other governmental entity on the effective date of this Act.
8580 (b) An offense or other violation of law committed before
8681 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when
8782 the offense or violation was committed, and the former law is
8883 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this
8984 subsection, an offense or violation was committed before the
9085 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense or
9186 violation occurred before that date.
9287 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
93- * * * * *