1 | 1 | | 85R1442 YDB-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Huffines S.B. No. 109 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the establishment of a limit on the number of terms a |
---|
8 | 8 | | judge or justice may serve on a court in this state. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 22, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 22.021 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 22.021. JUDICIAL TERM LIMITS. (a) The supreme court |
---|
13 | 13 | | by rule, in consultation with the court of criminal appeals, shall |
---|
14 | 14 | | establish a limit on the number of terms a judge or justice may be |
---|
15 | 15 | | elected to serve as the judge or justice of a court established |
---|
16 | 16 | | under the Texas Constitution, under state statutory law, or by |
---|
17 | 17 | | municipal ordinance. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) The term limits established in the rules adopted under |
---|
19 | 19 | | Subsection (a) may not allow a judge or justice to serve as a judge |
---|
20 | 20 | | or justice of any one court for more than 18 years. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (c) The limit on the number of terms a judge or justice may |
---|
22 | 22 | | serve as the judge or justice of a court as provided by Subsection |
---|
23 | 23 | | (a) applies only to service on that court. A judge or justice may |
---|
24 | 24 | | serve on more than one court for a number of terms that exceeds the |
---|
25 | 25 | | limit, provided the number of terms on any one court does not exceed |
---|
26 | 26 | | the limit established for service as a judge or justice on that |
---|
27 | 27 | | court. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c-1) A term that begins before January 1, 2019, is not |
---|
29 | 29 | | counted in determining whether a judge or justice is eligible to |
---|
30 | 30 | | serve on a court under Section 32, Article V, Texas Constitution. |
---|
31 | 31 | | This subsection expires February 1, 2039. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c-2) The supreme court shall establish the term limits as |
---|
33 | 33 | | required by Subsection (a) not later than December 1, 2018. This |
---|
34 | 34 | | subsection expires December 1, 2019. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect January 1, 2018, but only |
---|
36 | 36 | | if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Regular Session, 2017, limiting to two the number of terms for which |
---|
38 | 38 | | a person may be elected or appointed to hold certain state offices |
---|
39 | 39 | | and requiring the legislature to establish limits on the number of |
---|
40 | 40 | | terms judges and justices may serve on courts in this state is |
---|
41 | 41 | | approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the |
---|
42 | 42 | | voters, this Act has no effect. |
---|