Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB109 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/14/2016

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R1442 YDB-F
 By: Huffines S.B. No. 109


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a limit on the number of terms a
 judge or justice may serve on a court in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 22, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 22.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.021.  JUDICIAL TERM LIMITS. (a) The supreme court
 by rule, in consultation with the court of criminal appeals, shall
 establish a limit on the number of terms a judge or justice may be
 elected to serve as the judge or justice of a court established
 under the Texas Constitution, under state statutory law, or by
 municipal ordinance.
 (b)  The term limits established in the rules adopted under
 Subsection (a) may not allow a judge or justice to serve as a judge
 or justice of any one court for more than 18 years.
 (c)  The limit on the number of terms a judge or justice may
 serve as the judge or justice of a court as provided by Subsection
 (a) applies only to service on that court. A judge or justice may
 serve on more than one court for a number of terms that exceeds the
 limit, provided the number of terms on any one court does not exceed
 the limit established for service as a judge or justice on that
 court.
 (c-1)  A term that begins before January 1, 2019, is not
 counted in determining whether a judge or justice is eligible to
 serve on a court under Section 32, Article V, Texas Constitution.
 This subsection expires February 1, 2039.
 (c-2)  The supreme court shall establish the term limits as
 required by Subsection (a) not later than December 1, 2018. This
 subsection expires December 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017, limiting to two the number of terms for which
 a person may be elected or appointed to hold certain state offices
 and requiring the legislature to establish limits on the number of
 terms judges and justices may serve on courts in this state is
 approved by the voters.  If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.