Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1093 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hancock S.B. No. 1093
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2017; March 7, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 3, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1093 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of certain commercial motor vehicles
 that are not domiciled in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 548.052, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 548.052.  VEHICLES NOT SUBJECT TO INSPECTION.  This
 chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  a trailer, semitrailer, pole trailer, or mobile
 home moving under or bearing a current factory-delivery license
 plate or current in-transit license plate;
 (2)  a vehicle moving under or bearing a paper dealer
 in-transit tag, machinery license, disaster license, parade
 license, prorate tab, one-trip permit, vehicle temporary transit
 permit, antique license, custom vehicle license, street rod
 license, temporary 24-hour permit, or permit license;
 (3)  a trailer, semitrailer, pole trailer, or mobile
 home having an actual gross weight or registered gross weight of
 4,500 pounds or less;
 (4)  farm machinery, road-building equipment, a farm
 trailer, or a vehicle required to display a slow-moving-vehicle
 emblem under Section 547.703;
 (5)  a former military vehicle, as defined by Section
 504.502;
 (6)  a vehicle qualified for a tax exemption under
 Section 152.092, Tax Code; [or]
 (7)  a vehicle for which a certificate of title has been
 issued but that is not required to be registered; or
 (8)  a vehicle that:
 (A)  is not domiciled in this state;
 (B)  is registered:
 (i)  under the International Registration
 Plan as authorized by Section 502.091; or
 (ii)  as a token trailer under Section
 502.255, including for an extended period under Section 502.0023;
 and
 (C)  has been issued a certificate of inspection
 in compliance with federal motor carrier safety regulations.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *