E | 05/26/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/26/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3699 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
E | 05/15/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1952 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3486 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3248 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1147 | Journal Page: 3247 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3199 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1128 | Journal Page: 3199 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3199 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3199 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2591 | Journal Page: 3199 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1977 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1259 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1145 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |