Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1137 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Seliger S.B. No. 1137
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact
77 waste disposal facility.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Section 401.053, Health and Safety Code, is
1010 amended to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 401.053. CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM FOR LOW-LEVEL
1212 RADIOACTIVE WASTE. The department shall use the [may establish a]
1313 classification system for low-level radioactive waste that is
1414 established by the federal commission [based on radiological,
1515 chemical, and biological characteristics and on physical state] so
1616 that low-level radioactive waste can be managed safely and
1717 compatibly.
1818 SECTION 2. Section 401.207, Health and Safety Code, is
1919 amended by amending Subsections (e), and (e-2) and adding
2020 Subsection (1) to read as follows:
2121 (e) The compact waste disposal facility license holder may
2222 not collect a fee under this section or enter into a contract for
2323 the disposal of nonparty low-level radioactive waste that has been
2424 designated as Class A low-level radioactive waste under 10 C.F.R.
2525 Section 61.55 and commission rule unless the waste is
2626 containerized. The compact waste disposal facility license holder
2727 may, before September 1, 2027, collect a fee for and dispose of
2828 nonparty compact radioactive waste in an amount not to exceed:
2929 (1) 2.75 million curies; or
3030 (2) an amount greater than the amount under
3131 Subdivision (1) as specified by the license holder if the Texas
3232 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission determines
3333 that the license holder has shown good cause for the greater amount,
3434 considering:
3535 (A) the existing limits in the facility license,
3636 including radioactivity and volume limits in curies and cubic feet;
3737 (B) the as-built disposal capacity available in
3838 the facility to party state generators;
3939 (C) any expansion of the facility's disposal
4040 capacity that is actively under construction;
4141 (D) the potential effects of the proposed limit
4242 increase on the performance assessment of the facility;
4343 (E) the potential effects of the proposed limit
4444 increase on the health and safety of the employees; and
4545 (F) any other factor considered relevant by the
4646 Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission[:
4747 [(1) not more than the greater of:
4848 [(A) 1.167 million curies of nonparty compact
4949 waste; or
5050 [(B) an amount of nonparty compact waste equal to
5151 30 percent of the initial licensed capacity of the facility; and
5252 [(2) not more than 275,000 curies of nonparty compact
5353 waste in any fiscal year].
5454 (e-2) The commission's executive director, on completion of
5555 a [the] study under Section 401.208, may prohibit the license holder
5656 from accepting any additional nonparty compact waste if the
5757 commission determines from the study that the capacity of the
5858 facility will be limited, regardless of whether the limit under
5959 Subsection (e)[(f)] has been reached.
6060 (1) This section does not restrict or alter the authority of
6161 the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission
6262 under this chapter or Chapter 403 to approve the importation of
6363 nonparty compact waste to this state.
6464 SECTION 3. Sections 401.208(a), (c), and (e), Health and
6565 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
6666 (a) At least once every four years, the [The] commission
6767 shall conduct a study on the available volume and curie capacity of
6868 the compact waste disposal facility for the disposal of party state
6969 compact waste and nonparty compact waste.
7070 (c) The [Not later than December 1, 2016, the] commission
7171 shall submit a final report of the results of the study to the
7272 standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives
7373 with jurisdiction over the disposal of low-level radioactive waste.
7474 (e) The commission may conduct a study described by
7575 Subsection (a) at any time [after December 1, 2012,] if the
7676 commission determines that a study is necessary.
7777 SECTION 4. Section 401.216(a), Health and Safety Code, is
7878 amended to read as follows:
7979 (a) [The commission may license the compact waste disposal
8080 facility license holder to dispose of federal facility waste.] The
8181 commission may license federal facility waste disposal only at a
8282 separate and distinct facility that is operated exclusively for the
8383 disposal of federal facility waste and that is adjacent to the
8484 compact waste disposal facility.
8585 SECTION 5. Chapter 403, Health and Safety Code, is amended
8686 by adding Section 403.0056 to read as follows:
8787 Sec. 403.0056. COMPACT FACILITY CAPACITY. (a) In this
8888 section, "compact facility," "generator," "operator," and "party
8989 state" have the meanings assigned by Section 2.01, Texas Low-Level
9090 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact (Section 403.006 of this code).
9191 (b) The operator shall reserve disposal capacity in the
9292 amounts of four million cubic feet and three million curies for
9393 party state compact waste. The reserved capacity and curies are
9494 immediately set aside for party sate compact waste. The commission
9595 and the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall ensure
9696 that:
9797 (1) the reservation is maintained until the completion
9898 of decommissioning of all of the nuclear electric generation
9999 facilities in the party states; and
100100 (2) 20 percent of the volume and curie capacity
101101 reserved for party states is allotted to compact waste generated in
102102 Vermont.
103103 (c) For the purposes of operator licensing decisions based
104104 on storage capacity, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
105105 shall consider the disposal capacity reserved for party state
106106 compact waster under Subsection (b) as disposed.
107107 (d) When the compact facility reaches 90 percent of its
108108 as-built disposal capacity as measured by volume or curie, the
109109 operator shall discontinue accepting waste from nonparty states
110110 until:
111111 (1) construction is completed on a new disposal cell
112112 that provides a least an additional one million cubic feet of
113113 airspace capacity, as certified and stamped by an individual
114114 licensed as an engineer under Chapter 1001, Occupations Code; or
115115 (2) the operator executes a performance bond or other
116116 instrument of financial assurance determined to be acceptable by
117117 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality that is conditioned
118118 on the completion of a new disposal cell at the compact facility.
119119 SECTION 6. The following sections of the Health and Safety
120120 Code are repealed:
121121 (1) Section 401.005;
122122 (3) Sections 401.207(d-1), (d-2), (d-3), and (f);
123123 (4) Sections 401.216(b), (c), and (e); and
124124 (5) Section 401.2455.
125125 SECTION 7. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
126126 shall submit the first report required under Section 401.208,
127127 Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later than
128128 December 1, 2020.
129129 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
130130 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
131131 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
132132 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
133133 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.