Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1137 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Seliger S.B. No. 1137


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact
 waste disposal facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 401.053, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 401.053.  CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM FOR LOW-LEVEL
 RADIOACTIVE WASTE.  The department shall use the [may establish a]
 classification system for low-level radioactive waste that is
 established by the federal commission [based on radiological,
 chemical, and biological characteristics and on physical state] so
 that low-level radioactive waste can be managed safely and
 compatibly.
 SECTION 2.  Section 401.207, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (e), and (e-2) and adding
 Subsection (1) to read as follows:
 (e)  The compact waste disposal facility license holder may
 not collect a fee under this section or enter into a contract for
 the disposal of nonparty low-level radioactive waste that has been
 designated as Class A low-level radioactive waste under 10 C.F.R.
 Section 61.55 and commission rule unless the waste is
 containerized.  The compact waste disposal facility license holder
 may, before September 1, 2027, collect a fee for and dispose of
 nonparty compact radioactive waste in an amount not to exceed:
 (1)  2.75 million curies; or
 (2)  an amount greater than the amount under
 Subdivision (1) as specified by the license holder if the Texas
 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission determines
 that the license holder has shown good cause for the greater amount,
 considering:
 (A)  the existing limits in the facility license,
 including radioactivity and volume limits in curies and cubic feet;
 (B)  the as-built disposal capacity available in
 the facility to party state generators;
 (C)  any expansion of the facility's disposal
 capacity that is actively under construction;
 (D)  the potential effects of the proposed limit
 increase on the performance assessment of the facility;
 (E)  the potential effects of the proposed limit
 increase on the health and safety of the employees; and
 (F)  any other factor considered relevant by the
 Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission[:
 [(1)  not more than the greater of:
 [(A)     1.167 million curies of nonparty compact
 waste; or
 [(B)     an amount of nonparty compact waste equal to
 30 percent of the initial licensed capacity of the facility; and
 [(2)     not more than 275,000 curies of nonparty compact
 waste in any fiscal year].
 (e-2)  The commission's executive director, on completion of
 a [the] study under Section 401.208, may prohibit the license holder
 from accepting any additional nonparty compact waste if the
 commission determines from the study that the capacity of the
 facility will be limited, regardless of whether the limit under
 Subsection (e)[(f)] has been reached.
 (1)  This section does not restrict or alter the authority of
 the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission
 under this chapter or Chapter 403 to approve the importation of
 nonparty compact waste to this state.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 401.208(a), (c), and (e), Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  At least once every four years, the [The] commission
 shall conduct a study on the available volume and curie capacity of
 the compact waste disposal facility for the disposal of party state
 compact waste and nonparty compact waste.
 (c)  The [Not later than December 1, 2016, the] commission
 shall submit a final report of the results of the study to the
 standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives
 with jurisdiction over the disposal of low-level radioactive waste.
 (e)  The commission may conduct a study described by
 Subsection (a) at any time [after December 1, 2012,] if the
 commission determines that a study is necessary.
 SECTION 4.  Section 401.216(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  [The commission may license the compact waste disposal
 facility license holder to dispose of federal facility waste.]  The
 commission may license federal facility waste disposal only at a
 separate and distinct facility that is operated exclusively for the
 disposal of federal facility waste and that is adjacent to the
 compact waste disposal facility.
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 403, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 403.0056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0056.  COMPACT FACILITY CAPACITY.  (a)  In this
 section, "compact facility," "generator," "operator," and "party
 state" have the meanings assigned by Section 2.01, Texas Low-Level
 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact (Section 403.006 of this code).
 (b)  The operator shall reserve disposal capacity in the
 amounts of four million cubic feet and three million curies for
 party state compact waste.  The reserved capacity and curies are
 immediately set aside for party sate compact waste.  The commission
 and the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall ensure
 that:
 (1)  the reservation is maintained until the completion
 of decommissioning of all of the nuclear electric generation
 facilities in the party states; and
 (2)  20 percent of the volume and curie capacity
 reserved for party states is allotted to compact waste generated in
 Vermont.
 (c)  For the purposes of operator licensing decisions based
 on storage capacity, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall consider the disposal capacity reserved for party state
 compact waster under Subsection (b) as disposed.
 (d)  When the compact facility reaches 90 percent of its
 as-built disposal capacity as measured by volume or curie, the
 operator shall discontinue accepting waste from nonparty states
 until:
 (1)  construction is completed on a new disposal cell
 that provides a least an additional one million cubic feet of
 airspace capacity, as certified and stamped by an individual
 licensed as an engineer under Chapter 1001, Occupations Code; or
 (2)  the operator executes a performance bond or other
 instrument of financial assurance determined to be acceptable by
 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality that is conditioned
 on the completion of a new disposal cell at the compact facility.
 SECTION 6.  The following sections of the Health and Safety
 Code are repealed:
 (1)  Section 401.005;
 (3)  Sections 401.207(d-1), (d-2), (d-3), and (f);
 (4)  Sections 401.216(b), (c), and (e); and
 (5)  Section 401.2455.
 SECTION 7.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall submit the first report required under Section 401.208,
 Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.