House | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 3742 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3742 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3664 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1949 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1864 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1864 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1864 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hughes | Journal Page: 1864 |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1864 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1902 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1765 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1688 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |