Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1151 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1151
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2017; March 9, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 5, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 2; May 5, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1151 By:  Buckingham


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the protection of expressive activities at public
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9315 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9315.  PROTECTED EXPRESSION ON CAMPUS. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Expressive activities" means any speech or
 expressive conduct protected by the First Amendment to the United
 States Constitution or Section 8, Article I, Texas Constitution,
 and includes assemblies, protests, speeches, the distribution of
 written material, the carrying of signs, and the circulation of
 petitions.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each institution of higher education shall adopt a
 policy detailing students' and employees' rights to engage in
 expressive activities at the institution. The policy must:
 (1)  prohibit:
 (A)  reducing a student's grade for engaging in
 expressive activities; and
 (B)  increasing a student's grade for engaging in
 expressive activities, unless a variety of expressive activities
 and viewpoints, including the viewpoints of any political party,
 qualify for the increase;
 (2)  include a grievance procedure for addressing
 complaints of a violation of this section;
 (3)  be approved by a majority vote of the institution's
 governing board before final adoption; and
 (4)  be posted on the institution's Internet website.
 (c)  Each institution of higher education shall inform
 students enrolled at and employees of the institution of the policy
 adopted under Subsection (b), including by:
 (1)  discussing the policy during student orientation;
 and
 (2)  annually distributing a copy of the policy to
 students and employees.
 (d)  An institution of higher education or any employee of
 the institution may not punish a student or employee in any manner
 for engaging in expressive activities.
 SECTION 2.  If any provision of this Act or its application
 to any person or circumstance is held invalid, the invalidity does
 not affect other provisions or applications of this Act that can be
 given effect without the invalid provision or application, and the
 provisions of this Act are severable for this purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *