Senate | 04/10/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 457 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 457 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |