House | 05/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3002 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1975 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 1270 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1270 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1270 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1270 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |