Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1166 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Bettencourt, Garcia S.B. No. 1166
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2017; March 9, 2017, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 19, 2017,
4- reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
5- April 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
72
83
94 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
105 AN ACT
116 relating to providing for the review of certain county departments
127 of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.
138 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
149 SECTION 1. (a) The county department of education in a
1510 county with a population of four million or more according to the
1611 most recent federal decennial census is subject to review under
1712 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), as if the
1813 department were a state agency, but the department may not be
1914 abolished under that chapter. The review shall be conducted as if
2015 the department were scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2019.
2116 (b) The review must assess the department's governance,
2217 management, and operating structure, and the department's
2318 compliance with legislative requirements.
2419 (c) The department shall pay the cost incurred by the Sunset
2520 Advisory Commission in performing a review of the department under
2621 this section. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the
2722 cost, and the department shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of
2823 a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission detailing the cost.
2924 (d) This Act expires September 1, 2021.
3025 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
31- * * * * *