LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION May 7, 2017 TO: Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:SB1166 by Bettencourt (Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Engrossed Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1166, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION May 7, 2017 TO: Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:SB1166 by Bettencourt (Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Engrossed TO: Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: SB1166 by Bettencourt (Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Engrossed Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board SB1166 by Bettencourt (Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Engrossed SB1166 by Bettencourt (Relating to providing for the review of certain county departments of education by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Engrossed Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1166, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1166, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds 2018 $0 2019 $0 2020 $0 2021 $0 2022 $0 2018 $0 2019 $0 2020 $0 2021 $0 2022 $0 All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromAppropriated Receipts666 Probable Revenue Gain fromAppropriated Receipts666 2018 ($207,622) $207,622 2019 ($22,180) $22,180 2020 $0 $0 2021 $0 $0 2022 $0 $0 Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromAppropriated Receipts666 Probable Revenue Gain fromAppropriated Receipts666 2018 ($207,622) $207,622 2019 ($22,180) $22,180 2020 $0 $0 2021 $0 $0 2022 $0 $0 2018 ($207,622) $207,622 2019 ($22,180) $22,180 2020 $0 $0 2021 $0 $0 2022 $0 $0 Fiscal Analysis The bill would require a county department of education in a county with a population of four million or more according to the most recent federal decennial census to be subject to a one-time sunset review, but not abolishment, as if the department were to be scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2019. The bill would establish the requirements of the review and would require the Harris County Department of Education to reimburse the Sunset Advisory Commission (SAC) for the cost of performing the review. The bill would take effect September 1, 2017, and would expire on September 1, 2021. Methodology According to the most recent federal decennial census, only the Harris County Department of Education would be affected by the bill. Based on information provided by the SAC, it is assumed that total costs to conduct a Sunset review of the Harris County Department of Education would include $207,622 in 2018 and $22,180 in fiscal year 2019. This amount would provide for 3 staff members to conduct a seven month review and includes salaries, benefits, travel, and administrative costs. According to the SAC, 90 percent of the time to conduct the review would occur in fiscal year 2018 and 10 percent in fiscal year 2019. In addition, it is assumed that all travel would occur during fiscal year 2019. This analysis assumes the SAC would be reimbursed for performing reviews in accordance with the provisions of the bill. Costs and savings as well as the revenue gains and losses from payments to the SAC as a reimbursement for the review are reflected as Appropriated Receipts in the table above. Local Government Impact The estimated costs each fiscal year to the Harris County Department of Education for the required SAC review are reflected in the table above as Appropriated Receipts. Source Agencies: 116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 701 Texas Education Agency 116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 701 Texas Education Agency LBB Staff: UP, THo, MW UP, THo, MW