House | 05/20/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3993 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3993 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4002 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2449 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2227 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2019 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 458 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |