E | 06/09/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/09/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4244 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4566 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2493 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | RV#1537 | Journal Page: 4184 |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4047 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4047 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 460 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 460 | |
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |