E | 05/27/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
E | 05/19/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2226 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3885 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2119 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2226 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3615 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Record vote | RV#1293 | Journal Page: 3614 |
House | 05/17/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3614 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3515 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Record vote | RV#1275 | Journal Page: 3515 |
House | 05/16/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3515 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3514 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1429 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1429 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 475 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 474 |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 293 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 150 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |