E | 06/01/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/01/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4244 | |
E | 05/23/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4565 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2246 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#1428 | Journal Page: 3908 |
House | 05/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3908 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3908 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3858 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3858 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |