Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1220 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Miles, et al. S.B. No. 1220
2- (Vo)
1+S.B. No. 1220
32
43
5- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
64 AN ACT
75 relating to ensuring continuity of education and access to higher
86 education, career information, and skills certification for foster
97 care youth and former foster care youth.
108 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
119 SECTION 1. Section 25.007(b), Education Code, as amended by
1210 Chapters 746 (H.B. 1804), 822 (H.B. 3748), and 1206 (S.B. 1494),
1311 Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted
1412 and amended to read as follows:
1513 (b) In recognition of the challenges faced by students who
1614 are homeless or in substitute care, the agency shall assist the
1715 transition of students who are homeless or in substitute care from
1816 one school to another by:
1917 (1) ensuring that school records for a student who is
2018 homeless or in substitute care are transferred to the student's new
2119 school not later than the 10th working day after the date the
2220 student begins enrollment at the school;
2321 (2) developing systems to ease transition of a student
2422 who is homeless or in substitute care during the first two weeks of
2523 enrollment at a new school;
2624 (3) developing procedures for awarding credit,
2725 including partial credit if appropriate, for course work, including
2826 electives, completed by a student who is homeless or in substitute
2927 care while enrolled at another school;
3028 (4) developing procedures to ensure that a new school
3129 relies on decisions made by the previous school regarding placement
3230 in courses or educational programs of a student who is homeless or
3331 in substitute care and places the student in comparable courses or
3432 educational programs at the new school, if those courses or
3533 programs are available;
3634 (5) promoting practices that facilitate access by a
3735 student who is homeless or in substitute care to extracurricular
3836 programs, summer programs, credit transfer services, electronic
3937 courses provided under Chapter 30A, and after-school tutoring
4038 programs at nominal or no cost;
4139 (6) [(5)] establishing procedures to lessen the
4240 adverse impact of the movement of a student who is homeless or in
4341 substitute care to a new school;
4442 (7) [(6)] entering into a memorandum of understanding
4543 with the Department of Family and Protective Services regarding the
4644 exchange of information as appropriate to facilitate the transition
4745 of students in substitute care from one school to another;
4846 (8) [(7)] encouraging school districts and
4947 open-enrollment charter schools to provide services for a student
5048 who is homeless or in substitute care in transition when applying
5149 for admission to postsecondary study and when seeking sources of
5250 funding for postsecondary study;
5351 (9) [(8)] requiring school districts, campuses, and
5452 open-enrollment charter schools to accept a referral for special
5553 education services made for a student who is homeless or in
5654 substitute care by a school previously attended by the student, and
5755 to provide comparable services to the student during the referral
5856 process or until the new school develops an individualized
5957 education program for the student;
6058 (10) [(9)] requiring school districts, campuses, and
6159 open-enrollment charter schools to provide notice to the child's
6260 educational decision-maker and caseworker regarding events that
6361 may significantly impact the education of a child, including:
6462 (A) requests or referrals for an evaluation under
6563 Section 504, Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Section 794), or
6664 special education under Section 29.003;
6765 (B) admission, review, and dismissal committee
6866 meetings;
6967 (C) manifestation determination reviews required
7068 by Section 37.004(b);
7169 (D) any disciplinary actions under Chapter 37 for
7270 which parental notice is required;
7371 (E) citations issued for Class C misdemeanor
7472 offenses on school property or at school-sponsored activities;
7573 (F) reports of restraint and seclusion required
7674 by Section 37.0021; and
7775 (G) use of corporal punishment as provided by
7876 Section 37.0011;
7977 (11) [(10)] developing procedures for allowing a
8078 student who is homeless or in substitute care who was previously
8179 enrolled in a course required for graduation the opportunity, to
8280 the extent practicable, to complete the course, at no cost to the
8381 student, before the beginning of the next school year;
8482 (12) [(11)] ensuring that a student who is homeless or
8583 in substitute care who is not likely to receive a high school
8684 diploma before the fifth school year following the student's
8785 enrollment in grade nine, as determined by the district, has the
8886 student's course credit accrual and personal graduation plan
8987 reviewed;
9088 (13) [(12)] ensuring that a student in substitute care
9189 who is in grade 11 or 12 be provided information regarding tuition
9290 and fee exemptions under Section 54.366 for dual-credit or other
9391 courses provided by a public institution of higher education for
9492 which a high school student may earn joint high school and college
9593 credit; [and]
9694 (14) [(13)] designating at least one agency employee
9795 to act as a liaison officer regarding educational issues related to
9896 students in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and
9997 Protective Services; and
10098 (15) [(14)] providing other assistance as identified
10199 by the agency.
102100 SECTION 2. Section 25.007, Education Code, is amended by
103101 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
104102 (c) The commissioner may establish rules to implement this
105103 section and to facilitate the transition between schools of
106104 children who are homeless or in substitute care.
107105 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
108106 amended by adding Section 264.1211 to read as follows:
109107 Sec. 264.1211. CAREER DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION PROGRAM.
110108 (a) The department shall collaborate with local workforce
111109 development boards, foster care transition centers, community and
112110 technical colleges, schools, and any other appropriate workforce
113111 industry resources to create a program that:
114112 (1) assists foster care youth and former foster care
115113 youth in obtaining:
116114 (A) a high school diploma or a high school
117115 equivalency certificate; and
118116 (B) industry certifications that are necessary
119117 for occupations that are in high demand;
120118 (2) provides career guidance to foster care youth and
121119 former foster care youth; and
122120 (3) informs foster care youth and former foster care
123121 youth about the tuition and fee waivers for institutions of higher
124122 education that are available under Section 54.366, Education Code.
125123 (b) Not later than September 1, 2018, the department, in
126124 collaboration with the Texas Education Agency, shall produce a
127125 report on the program created under Subsection (a). The report must
128126 include recommendations for legislative or other action to further
129127 develop the program. The department shall submit the report to the
130128 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
131129 representatives, and the standing committees of the legislature
132130 with jurisdiction over education. This subsection expires
133131 September 1, 2019.
134132 SECTION 4. Section 25.007(b), Education Code, as reenacted
135133 and amended by this Act, applies beginning with the 2017-2018
136134 school year.
137135 SECTION 5. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
138136 over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017,
139137 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
140138 codes.
141139 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
142140 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
143141 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
144142 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
145143 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
144+ ______________________________ ______________________________
145+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
146+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1220 passed the Senate on
147+ May 4, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
148+ ______________________________
149+ Secretary of the Senate
150+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1220 passed the House on
151+ May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, one
152+ present not voting.
153+ ______________________________
154+ Chief Clerk of the House
155+ Approved:
156+ ______________________________
157+ Date
158+ ______________________________
159+ Governor