House
|
05/24/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4790
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4790
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3529
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1273
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1193
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 463
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 463
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|