House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3591 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3154 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |