Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1239 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 1239
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
4- Affairs; May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 3, 2017,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1239 By: Rodríguez
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to the authority of a municipality to remove directors of
147 the North Texas Municipal Water District.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
169 SECTION 1. Section 3(a), Chapter 62, Acts of the 52nd
1710 Legislature, Regular Session, 1951, is amended to read as follows:
1811 Sec. 3(a). All powers of the District shall be exercised by
1912 a board of directors. Such directors shall be appointed by majority
2013 vote for the governing body of each of the cities contained in the
2114 District. In appointing the first directors for a city containing
2215 5,000 population or more according to the most recent Federal
2316 Census, the governing body of such city shall appoint one director
2417 who shall serve to and including May 31, 1952, and one who shall
2518 serve to and including May 31, 1953. In May, 1952, and in May of
2619 each year thereafter, the governing body of such city shall appoint
2720 one director for the two year term beginning on June 1 of that year.
2821 In appointing the first director for a city of less than 5,000
2922 population, according to the most recent Federal Census, the
3023 governing body of such city shall appoint one director who shall
3124 serve to and including May 31, 1952. In May, 1952, and in May of
3225 each even year thereafter, the governing body shall appoint one
3326 director for the two year term beginning on June 1 of that year.
3427 Each director shall serve for his term of office as herein provided,
3528 and thereafter until his successor shall be appointed and
3629 qualified. Notwithstanding any other law, a director serves at the
3730 pleasure of the governing body of the city that appointed the
3831 director and may be removed by the governing body at any time
3932 without cause. No person shall be appointed a director unless he
4033 resides in and owns taxable property in the city from which he is
4134 appointed. No member of a governing body of a city, and no employee
4235 of a city, shall be appointed as director. Such directors shall
4336 subscribe to the Constitutional oath of office, and each shall give
4437 bond for the faithful performance of his duties in the amount of
4538 $5,000.00, the cost of which shall be paid by the District. A
4639 majority shall constitute a quorum.
4740 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4841 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
4942 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5043 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5144 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
52- * * * * *