Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1239 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 1239
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
 Affairs; May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 3, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1239 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a municipality to remove directors of
 the North Texas Municipal Water District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3(a), Chapter 62, Acts of the 52nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1951, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3(a).  All powers of the District shall be exercised by
 a board of directors. Such directors shall be appointed by majority
 vote for the governing body of each of the cities contained in the
 District. In appointing the first directors for a city containing
 5,000 population or more according to the most recent Federal
 Census, the governing body of such city shall appoint one director
 who shall serve to and including May 31, 1952, and one who shall
 serve to and including May 31, 1953. In May, 1952, and in May of
 each year thereafter, the governing body of such city shall appoint
 one director for the two year term beginning on June 1 of that year.
 In appointing the first director for a city of less than 5,000
 population, according to the most recent Federal Census, the
 governing body of such city shall appoint one director who shall
 serve to and including May 31, 1952. In May, 1952, and in May of
 each even year thereafter, the governing body shall appoint one
 director for the two year term beginning on June 1 of that year.
 Each director shall serve for his term of office as herein provided,
 and thereafter until his successor shall be appointed and
 qualified. Notwithstanding any other law, a director serves at the
 pleasure of the governing body of the city that appointed the
 director and may be removed by the governing body at any time
 without cause.  No person shall be appointed a director unless he
 resides in and owns taxable property in the city from which he is
 appointed. No member of a governing body of a city, and no employee
 of a city, shall be appointed as director. Such directors shall
 subscribe to the Constitutional oath of office, and each shall give
 bond for the faithful performance of his duties in the amount of
 $5,000.00, the cost of which shall be paid by the District. A
 majority shall constitute a quorum.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *