House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3890 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1422 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 933 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 917 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 858 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 479 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 479 | |
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |