House
|
05/19/2017
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Taylor of Galveston
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 482
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|