House | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3452 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3153 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1730 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |