Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1294 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1294
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 3, 2017,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2;
 May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to election of professional staff representatives to
 certain school district planning and decision-making committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.251, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  The board shall adopt a procedure, consistent with
 Subsection (e-1) and Section 21.407(a), for the professional staff
 in the district to nominate and elect the professional staff
 representatives who shall meet with the board or the board designee
 as required under this section.  At least two-thirds of the elected
 professional staff representatives must be classroom teachers.  The
 remaining staff representatives shall include both campus- and
 district-level professional staff members.  If practicable, the
 committee membership shall include at least one professional staff
 representative with the primary responsibility for educating
 students with disabilities.  Board policy must provide procedures
 for:
 (1)  the selection of parents to the district-level and
 campus-level committees; and
 (2)  the selection of community members and business
 representatives to serve on the district-level committee in a
 manner that provides for appropriate representation of the
 community's diversity.
 (e-1)  The procedure for the election of professional staff
 representatives to a campus-level or district-level committee
 under Subsection (e):
 (1)  must provide for appropriate and inclusive
 representation of the district's professional staff; and
 (2)  may not limit eligibility for election to members
 of a single professional association or organization.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *