E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1326
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1313
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3238
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Burton
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1210
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|