LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1343
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1343
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1343
Compare Versions
SB1343 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1343 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1343 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB1343 Comm Sub May 9, 2017
SB1343 Engrossed April 20, 2017
SB1343 Comm Sub April 11, 2017
SB1343 Introduced March 6, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB1343 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1343 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1343 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB1343 Comm Sub May 9, 2017
SB1343 Engrossed April 20, 2017
SB1343 Comm Sub April 11, 2017
SB1343 Introduced March 6, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare