1 | | - | By: Watson S.B. No. 1346 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2017; March 14, 2017, read |
---|
3 | | - | first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
4 | | - | April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, |
---|
5 | | - | Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Watson, Huffman, Nelson S.B. No. 1346 |
---|
7 | 2 | | |
---|
8 | 3 | | |
---|
9 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 6 | | relating to disclosure of state agency contract information |
---|
12 | 7 | | regarding administrator services for group health benefit plans. |
---|
13 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 9 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter H, Chapter 2158, |
---|
15 | 10 | | Government Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 11 | | SUBCHAPTER H. PURCHASE OF PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGER SERVICES OR OF |
---|
17 | 12 | | ADMINISTRATOR SERVICES FOR GROUP HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN |
---|
18 | 13 | | SECTION 2. Section 2158.401(b), Government Code, is amended |
---|
19 | 14 | | to read as follows: |
---|
20 | 15 | | (b) This subchapter applies in relation to a state agency |
---|
21 | 16 | | contract or proposed contract for pharmacy benefit manager services |
---|
22 | 17 | | or for services as an administrator for a group health benefit plan |
---|
23 | 18 | | without regard to whether the contract or proposed contract is |
---|
24 | 19 | | otherwise subject to this subtitle. |
---|
25 | 20 | | SECTION 3. Section 2158.402, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
26 | 21 | | amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (a-1) and |
---|
27 | 22 | | (d) to read as follows: |
---|
28 | 23 | | (a) A state agency on request of another state agency shall |
---|
29 | 24 | | disclose information relating to the amounts charged by: |
---|
30 | 25 | | (1) a pharmacy benefit manager for pharmacy benefit |
---|
31 | 26 | | manager services provided under a prescription drug program and |
---|
32 | 27 | | other requested pricing information related to a contract for |
---|
33 | 28 | | pharmacy benefit manager services; or |
---|
34 | 29 | | (2) an administrator of a health benefit plan for |
---|
35 | 30 | | services provided for a group health benefit plan and other |
---|
36 | 31 | | requested pricing information related to a contract for |
---|
37 | 32 | | administrator services for a group health benefit plan. |
---|
38 | 33 | | (a-1) A state agency shall provide information requested |
---|
39 | 34 | | under this section not later than the 30th day after the date the |
---|
40 | 35 | | information is requested. |
---|
41 | 36 | | (b) Subsection (a) does not require a state agency to |
---|
42 | 37 | | disclose information the agency is specifically prohibited from |
---|
43 | 38 | | disclosing under a contract with: |
---|
44 | 39 | | (1) a pharmacy benefit manager executed before |
---|
45 | 40 | | September 1, 2009; or |
---|
46 | 41 | | (2) an administrator for a health benefit plan |
---|
47 | 42 | | executed before September 1, 2017. |
---|
48 | 43 | | (d) A contract entered, amended, or extended on or after |
---|
49 | 44 | | September 1, 2017, may not contain a provision that prohibits a |
---|
50 | 45 | | state agency from disclosing under this subchapter information on |
---|
51 | 46 | | the amounts charged by an administrator for a health benefit plan |
---|
52 | 47 | | for services provided for a group health benefit plan or from |
---|
53 | 48 | | disclosing under this subchapter other pricing information related |
---|
54 | 49 | | to the contract. |
---|
55 | 50 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|