Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1346 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1346
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2017; March 14, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disclosure of state agency contract information
 regarding administrator services for group health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter H, Chapter 2158,
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H.  PURCHASE OF PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGER SERVICES OR OF
 ADMINISTRATOR SERVICES FOR GROUP HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN
 SECTION 2.  Section 2158.401(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  This subchapter applies in relation to a state agency
 contract or proposed contract for pharmacy benefit manager services
 or for services as an administrator for a group health benefit plan
 without regard to whether the contract or proposed contract is
 otherwise subject to this subtitle.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2158.402, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (a-1) and
 (d) to read as follows:
 (a)  A state agency on request of another state agency shall
 disclose information relating to the amounts charged by:
 (1)  a pharmacy benefit manager for pharmacy benefit
 manager services provided under a prescription drug program and
 other requested pricing information related to a contract for
 pharmacy benefit manager services; or
 (2)  an administrator of a health benefit plan for
 services provided for a group health benefit plan and other
 requested pricing information related to a contract for
 administrator services for a group health benefit plan.
 (a-1)  A state agency shall provide information requested
 under this section not later than the 30th day after the date the
 information is requested.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not require a state agency to
 disclose information the agency is specifically prohibited from
 disclosing under a contract with:
 (1)  a pharmacy benefit manager executed before
 September 1, 2009; or
 (2)  an administrator for a health benefit plan
 executed before September 1, 2017.
 (d)  A contract entered, amended, or extended on or after
 September 1, 2017, may not contain a provision that prohibits a
 state agency from disclosing under this subchapter information on
 the amounts charged by an administrator for a health benefit plan
 for services provided for a group health benefit plan or from
 disclosing under this subchapter other pricing information related
 to the contract.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *