House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 03/21/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 558 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |