Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1350 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1350
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2017; March 14, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 26, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 26, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the commitment of certain juveniles to local
 post-adjudication secure correctional facilities in certain
 counties and to the release under supervision of those juveniles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 261.101(e), Human Resources Code, as
 amended by Section 11(a), Chapter 854 (S.B. 1149), and Chapter 962
 (S.B. 1630), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
 is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter,
 the powers of the office include:
 (1)  facilities operated and services provided by the
 department under Subtitle C;
 (2)  post-adjudication correctional facilities under
 Section 51.125, Family Code, or Section 152.0016 of this code;
 (3)  any other residential facility in which a child
 adjudicated as having engaged in conduct indicating a need for
 supervision or delinquent conduct is placed by court order; and
 (4)  the investigation of complaints alleging a
 violation of the rights of the children placed in a facility
 described by Subdivision (2) or (3).
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Section 54.04011(f), Family Code;
 (2)  Sections 152.0016(l) and 261.101(f), Human
 Resources Code; and
 (3)  Section 11(b), Chapter 854 (S.B. 1149), Acts of
 the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Section
 261.101(e), Human Resources Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *