House | 05/19/2017 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3482 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1422 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 933 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 916 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |