Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1414 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1414
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 March 30, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a recipient's disenrollment from a Medicaid managed
 care plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 533.0076(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission shall allow a recipient who is enrolled
 in a managed care plan under this chapter to disenroll from that
 plan and enroll in another managed care plan[:
 [(1)]  at any time for cause in accordance with federal
 law[; and
 [(2)     once for any reason after the periods described
 by Subsections (a) and (b)].
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *