Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1434 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1434
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 11, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0,
 1 present not voting; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1434 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compensation of county auditors and assistant auditors
 in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.905, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  This subsection applies only to a county auditor or
 assistant auditor appointed to serve a county located on an
 international border that has a population of less than 300,000 and
 contains one or more municipalities with a population of 200,000 or
 more.  In setting the compensation for a county auditor or assistant
 auditor considered at a hearing under this section, the district
 judge or judges may not set the amount of compensation in an amount
 that is inconsistent with a wage and position classification plan
 adopted by the county.
 SECTION 2.  For a county auditor or assistant auditor
 appointed before the effective date of this Act whose compensation
 does not conform to the person's position classification as
 provided by a wage and position classification plan adopted by the
 county that the person serves, the district judge or judges, in
 subsequent hearings setting the person's annual compensation,
 shall, without reducing the person's annual compensation, align the
 person's compensation with the wage and position classification
 plan adopted by the county.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *