E | 06/01/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/01/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4244 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4804 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2963 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3141 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2622 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4393 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | RV#1617 | Journal Page: 4392 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4392 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4392 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4249 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4249 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3020 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3020 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2298 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1638 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |