|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|