Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1450 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2017

                            S.B. No. 1450


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulatory authority of the commissioner of
 insurance and the Texas Department of Insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.004, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 36.004.  COMPLIANCE WITH NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF
 INSURANCE COMMISSIONERS REQUIREMENTS; RULES. (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (c) and Section 36.005, the department may
 not require an insurer to comply with a rule, regulation,
 directive, or standard adopted by the National Association of
 Insurance Commissioners, including a rule, regulation, directive,
 or standard relating to policy reserves, unless application of the
 rule, regulation, directive, or standard is expressly authorized by
 statute [and approved by the commissioner].
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), a version of a rule,
 regulation, directive, or standard is expressly authorized by
 statute if:
 (1)  the statute explicitly authorizes the
 commissioner to adopt rules consistent with the rule, regulation,
 directive, or standard; or
 (2)  that version is the latest version of the rule,
 regulation, directive, or standard on the date that the statute was
 enacted.
 (c)  The commissioner may adopt a rule to require compliance
 with a rule, regulation, directive, or standard adopted by the
 National Association of Insurance Commissioners if:
 (1)  the commissioner finds the rule is technical or
 nonsubstantive in nature or necessary to preserve the department's
 accreditation; and
 (2)  before the adoption of the rule, the commissioner
 provides the standing committees of the senate and house of
 representatives with primary jurisdiction over the department with
 written notice of the commissioner's intent to adopt the rule.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 36, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 36.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.007.  RULES RELATING TO AGREEMENTS LIMITING STATE
 AUTHORITY TO REGULATE INSURANCE PROHIBITED; EFFECT OF AGREEMENT.
 (a)  The commissioner may not adopt or enforce a rule that
 implements an interstate, national, or international agreement
 that:
 (1)  infringes on the authority of this state to
 regulate the business of insurance in this state; and
 (2)  was not approved by the legislature.
 (b)  An agreement described by Subsection (a) has no effect
 on the authority of this state to regulate the business of insurance
 in this state unless the agreement is approved by the legislature.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 551, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 551.1041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.1041.  RULEMAKING AUTHORITY RELATING TO NOTICE OF
 CANCELLATION OF CERTAIN PERSONAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COVERAGES.
 The commissioner shall exercise the commissioner's rulemaking
 authority to adopt rules under which an insurer that cancels a
 personal automobile insurance policy that provides comprehensive
 or collision physical damage coverage for an automobile that is
 subject to a purchase money lien is required to notify the
 lienholder, if known, that the coverage will be canceled.
 SECTION 4.  Section 36.004, Insurance Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a rule adopted or amended on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A rule adopted before the effective
 date of this Act and not amended on or after that date is governed by
 the law applicable to the rule immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1450 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 26, 2017,
 Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested
 appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted Conference
 Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1450 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 4, one present not voting; May 27, 2017, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 99, Nays 47, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor