Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1495 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/12/2017

                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1495
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access by the division of workers' compensation to
 certain designated doctor contracts under the workers'
 compensation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 408.1225, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as follows:
 (g)  On request of the division, a designated doctor shall
 provide the division with a copy of any contract that is:
 (1)  between the designated doctor and an authorized
 agent of the doctor; and
 (2)  for services provided by the agent related to the
 designated doctor's duties, including scheduling, billing, and
 organizing medical records.
 (h)  A contract provided to the division under Subsection (g)
 is not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *