House | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3018 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1067 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 111 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 111 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |