Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB151 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 151
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 25, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; March 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to voter approval of obligations for certain municipal
 liabilities to a public pension fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 107, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 107.0035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 107.0035.  VOTER APPROVAL REQUIRED FOR PENSION FUND
 OBLIGATIONS.  A municipality may issue an obligation under Section
 107.003 only if the issuance is approved by a majority of the
 qualified voters of the municipality voting at an election held for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 2.  Section 107.0035, Local Government Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to obligations for which the
 governing body of a municipality executes an agreement under
 Section 107.003(b), Local Government Code, on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *